This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2019 at 01:23:34 (UTC).

BE WELL NURSING, LLC. VS SUCCESS HEALTHCARE 1, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 BE WELL NURSING, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUCCESS HEALTHCARE 1, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4249

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BE WELL NURSING LLC.

Defendant

SUCCESS HEALTHCARE 1 LLC DBA SILVER LAKE MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAHMAZIAN JILBERT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/7/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/7/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/14/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

5/24/2019: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 11/20/2019

11/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 11/20/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)

11/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • Hearing05/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 11/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by BE WELL NURSING, LLC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by BE WELL NURSING, LLC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BE WELL NURSING, LLC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BE WELL NURSING, LLC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BE WELL NURSING, LLC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUCCESS HEALTHCARE 1 is a litigant

Latest cases where BE WELL NURNSING LLC (DOE 1) is a litigant