This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 03:23:02 (UTC).

BAZZLE LEGGETT, AN INDIVIDUAL VS JIFFY LUBE INTERNATIONAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 BAZZLE LEGGETT, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JIFFY LUBE INTERNATIONAL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0771

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEGGETT AN INDIVIDUAL BAZZLE

Defendants

JIFFY LUBE INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

AROLBO AN INDIVIDUAL AN INDIVIDUAL GABRIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ DARIO C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/28/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/9/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Hearing01/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BAZZLE LEGGETT, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BAZZLE LEGGETT, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BAZZLE LEGGETT, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jiffy Lube International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOMEZ DARIO C.