This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 00:30:12 (UTC).

BAY CLUB LOS ANGELES INC VS LYLE PARKS JR INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 BAY CLUB LOS ANGELES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LYLE PARKS JR INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3093

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAY CLUB LOS ANGELES INC

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LYLE PARKS JR. INC

VESTAR PENINSULA RETAIL LLC

REYES SINGLE PLY ROOFING MASTERS CORP.

LYLE PARKS JR. INC.

LYLE PARKS JR. CONSTRUCTION

Cross Defendant and Defendant

REYES SINGLE PLY ROOFING MASTERS CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANDLER JONATHAN

DENTON DAVID RUSSELL

Defendant Attorney

LEONARD EDWARD R.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

REINHOLTZ JACK RUSSELL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

LYLE PARKS, JR. CONSTRUCTION AND VESTAR PENINSULA RETIAL'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/5/2018: LYLE PARKS, JR. CONSTRUCTION AND VESTAR PENINSULA RETIAL'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/5/2018: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/4/2018: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

5/4/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DOCUMENTS SET THREE.

8/7/2018: DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DOCUMENTS SET THREE.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.

PLAINTIFF BAY CLUB LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST. FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE

9/18/2018: PLAINTIFF BAY CLUB LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST. FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE

PLAINTIFF BAY CLUB LOS ANGELES OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET THREE

9/18/2018: PLAINTIFF BAY CLUB LOS ANGELES OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET THREE

DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE

9/24/2018: DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE

Minute Order

10/1/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS LYLE PARKS, JR., CONSTRUCTION AND VESTAR PENINSULA RETAIL, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE

10/1/2018: DEFENDANTS LYLE PARKS, JR., CONSTRUCTION AND VESTAR PENINSULA RETAIL, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE

Order

11/5/2018: Order

Minute Order

11/5/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

11/5/2018: Ex Parte Application

Complaint in Intervention

11/6/2018: Complaint in Intervention

Summons

11/6/2018: Summons

Notice of Ruling

11/7/2018: Notice of Ruling

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (and Stipulation to Continue Trial; [Proposed] Order) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application and Stipulation to Continue T...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by LYLE PARKS JR. INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by LYLE PARKS JR. INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BAY CLUB LOS ANGELES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less