This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 19:10:30 (UTC).

BAXTER, BRYAN DAVID - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 BAXTER, BRYAN DAVID - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5424

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAXTER FORTIER E JR

Decedent

BAXTER BRYAN DAVID

Not Classified By Court

TUCKER JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEVONNE SADARA

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

6/2/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

7/8/2021: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

8/17/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Minute Order

8/25/2021: Minute Order

Order

9/1/2021: Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

9/2/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Letters (Initial)

9/10/2021: Letters (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • Hearing01/25/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVONNE SADARA