This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 18:31:29 (UTC).

BAXTER, BRYAN DAVID - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 BAXTER, BRYAN DAVID - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARRY, WILLIAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9690

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARRY, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAXTER JR. FORTIER E.

Decedent

BAXTER BRYAN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEVONNE SADARA

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

11/18/2020: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Request - Continuance (1st Request)

12/15/2020: Request - Continuance (1st Request)

Minute Order

1/22/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - Verified Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

1/21/2021: Supplement - Verified Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Verified Supplement to Clear Probate Notes ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketRequest - Continuance (1st Request); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVONNE SADARA