Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 15:56:24 (UTC).

BASTA, INC. VS ZASLAVSKY NEAL

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 BASTA, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ZASLAVSKY NEAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4784

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BASTA INC.

Defendant

ZASLAVSKY NEAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMM BENJAMIN G.

Defendant Attorney

ZASLAVSKY NEAL

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN RAMM REGARDING ATTEMPTS TO EFFECT SERVICE

1/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN RAMM REGARDING ATTEMPTS TO EFFECT SERVICE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES BASTA, INC.

1/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES BASTA, INC.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; CASE MANAGEMEN...)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; CASE MANAGEMEN...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/20/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

10/20/2020: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/2/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

10/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/07/2020

10/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/07/2020

Proof of Personal Service

9/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROOF OF SERVICE)

9/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROOF OF SERVICE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

8/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/16/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/17/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • Hearing03/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Hearing03/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Case Managemen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (BASTA, Inc.); Filed by BASTA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Benjamin Ramm Regarding Attempts to Effect Service); Filed by BASTA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDefault/Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BASTA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BASTA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BASTA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BASTA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV14784    Hearing Date: January 11, 2021    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

BASTA, INC.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

NEAL ZASLAVSKY, et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: 20STCV14784

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Date: January 11, 2021

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Neal Zaslavsky

The Court has considered the moving papers. No opposition papers were filed.

BACKGROUND

Defendant filed a motion to quash service of the summons and complaint (the “Motion”)[1] on the grounds that he was never properly served with the summons and complaint in a manner consistent with or as provided for by California law. The Motion is unopposed. Due to the lack of opposition, the Court GRANTS the Motion under Sexton v. Superior Court (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 1403, 1410.

Moving party is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

In consideration of the current COVID-19 pandemic situation, the Court strongly encourages that appearances on all proceedings, including this one, be made by LACourtConnect if the parties do not submit on the tentative.  If you instead intend to make an appearance in person at Court on this matter, you must send an email by 2 p.m. on the last Court day before the scheduled date of the hearing to SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 11th day of January 2021

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court


[1] The notice of motion states that Defendant is specially appearing for the sole purpose of quashing the service of the summons and complaint.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BASTA INC. & BASTA UNIVERSAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMM BENJAMIN G.