This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:09:27 (UTC).

BASTA INC VS 4 STREETS CO-OP OF RTE 2 INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 BASTA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 4 STREETS CO-OP OF RTE 2 INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0436

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BASTA INC.

Defendants and Respondents

4 STREETS CO-OP OF RTE 2 INC.

SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB

DOES 1 - 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RAMM BENJAMIN G. ESQ

POST ERIC MITCHELL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RICHARDSON LYNE A. ESQ.

BRODSKY BARRY Z. ESQ.

TRAYLOR JENNIFER ELIZABETH

WITTE ALEXANDRIA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Unknown

3/23/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

10/29/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

Order

2/14/2019: Order

DEFENDANT 4 STREETS CO-OP OF RTE 2, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

1/9/2018: DEFENDANT 4 STREETS CO-OP OF RTE 2, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANTS WEDELSON GOTTLIEB'S OBJECTION TO THE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE BY SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB

12/8/2017: DEFENDANTS WEDELSON GOTTLIEB'S OBJECTION TO THE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE BY SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB

DEFENDANT SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 425.16 AND 425.18; DECLARATION OF JENNIFER E. TRAYLOR

11/16/2017: DEFENDANT SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 425.16 AND 425.18; DECLARATION OF JENNIFER E. TRAYLOR

Proof of Service

11/7/2017: Proof of Service

OBJECTION TO CONSIDERATION OF REPLIES BY SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB

11/14/2017: OBJECTION TO CONSIDERATION OF REPLIES BY SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SWEDELSON GOTTLIEB'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SUBSECTIONS 425.16 AND 425.18

10/19/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SWEDELSON GOTTLIEB'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SUBSECTIONS 425.16 AND 425.18

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

10/19/2017: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SWEDELSON GOTTLIEB'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

10/6/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SWEDELSON GOTTLIEB'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

10/6/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

Proof of Service

9/12/2017: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/12/2017: Proof of Service

SUMMONS

7/31/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL USE OF CIVIL PROCEEDINGS

7/31/2017: COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL USE OF CIVIL PROCEEDINGS

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( FOR ORDER STAYING MATTER PENDING RESOLUTION OF APPEAL; DECLARATION OF JENNIFER E. NEWCOMB) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Order (PROPOSEDJ ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ST A YING MATTER PENDING RESOLUTION OF APPEAL); Filed by Swedelsongottlieb (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (DEFENDANT SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING MATTER PENDING RESOLUTION OF APPEAL; DECLARATION OF JENNIFER E. NEWCOMB); Filed by Swedelsongottlieb (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Swedelsongottlieb (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Swedelsongottlieb (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Minute Order ((Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Basta, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Basta, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Basta, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Basta, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL USE OF CIVIL PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BASTA INC. & BASTA UNIVERSAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SWEDELSONGOTTLIEB A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where 4 STREETS CO-OP OF RTE 2 INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant