This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 01:31:28 (UTC).

BASIC PLUS, INC. VS. LOVE VINTAGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 BASIC PLUS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOVE VINTAGE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7096

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BASIC PLUS INC. A CALIFORNIA

Defendants

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL SOO JUNG

LOVE VINTAGE INC. A CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KOHAN LAW FIRM

KOHAN ESQ. KAMBIZ TOM

Defendant Attorneys

KIM ESQ. JASON JOHN

YOON JASON T.

KIM JASON J. LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Summons

4/26/2018: Summons

Legacy Document

4/26/2018: Legacy Document

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/26/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document

5/14/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

5/16/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

5/25/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

7/19/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/25/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

9/25/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

11/7/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

11/8/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

11/21/2018: Notice of Ruling

Declaration

11/21/2018: Declaration

Case Management Statement

11/21/2018: Case Management Statement

Declaration

12/24/2018: Declaration

Notice of Ruling

12/28/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

12/28/2018: Minute Order

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment; Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Order (re: hearing of 6/18/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Issuance of Writ of Attachement); Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Opposition (Writ of Attachment); Filed by LOVE VINTAGE, INC., a California (Defendant); Soo Jung Kim, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Declaration (of Edwin Shaolian in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Issuance of Writ of Attachment); Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Issuance of Writ of Attachment); Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Summons; Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by BASIC PLUS, INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOVE VINTAGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOON JASON T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JASON JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JASON J. ESQ.