This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 23:12:23 (UTC).

BASHIR HAJJAR ET AL VS ACG INDUSTRIES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 BASHIR HAJJAR filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against ACG INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8951

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HAJJAR BASHIR

CORE STRATEGIC INVESTMENTS LLC

GAREEB ALEXANDER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MISLE HOWARD

SELTZER PETER

ACG INDUSTRIES INC.

ACC INDUSTRIES INC.

RECYCLING SPECIALIST INC.

MI-SIX LLC

AMERICAN METAL RECYCLING SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH MATTHEW CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

PAPPY ELIZABETH M

KLEIN ROBERT GARY

Cross Defendant Attorney

YEE STEVEN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

2/28/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

DECLARATION OF ERIC 0. ZEIGER IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB''S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS'' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/28/2018: DECLARATION OF ERIC 0. ZEIGER IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB''S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS'' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS'COMPLAINT

2/28/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS'COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANTS BASHIR HAJJAR AND CORE STRATEGIC INVESTMENTS, LLC'S ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/28/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANTS BASHIR HAJJAR AND CORE STRATEGIC INVESTMENTS, LLC'S ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/28/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/8/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

3/8/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

CROSS COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO CROSS DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

3/8/2018: CROSS COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO CROSS DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINANT ACG INDUSTRIES' OPPOSITION TO CROSS DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S MOTION TO STRIKE

3/8/2018: CROSS COMPLAINANT ACG INDUSTRIES' OPPOSITION TO CROSS DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S MOTION TO STRIKE

CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB?S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

3/12/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB?S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ACG INDUSTRIES, INC., HOWARD MISLE, AND PETER SELTZER'S OPPOSITION TO HIS DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/22/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ACG INDUSTRIES, INC., HOWARD MISLE, AND PETER SELTZER'S OPPOSITION TO HIS DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S REPLY CROSS- COMPLAINANTS ACG INDUSTRIES, INC., HOWARD MISLE, AND PETER SELTZER'S OPPOSITION TO HIS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CR

3/22/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S REPLY CROSS- COMPLAINANTS ACG INDUSTRIES, INC., HOWARD MISLE, AND PETER SELTZER'S OPPOSITION TO HIS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CR

Minute Order

3/29/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/3/2018: Minute Order

CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S NOTICE OF RULING ON HIS DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS- COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPL

4/5/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S NOTICE OF RULING ON HIS DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS- COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPL

CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S NOTICE OF RULING ON HIS DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLA

4/5/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEXANDER GAREEB'S NOTICE OF RULING ON HIS DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLA

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE

4/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Alexander Gareeb (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Status Conference (re Stay) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re Stay)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Compel Alexander Gareeb to attend deposition, produce documents and sanctions) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 24; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 24; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 24; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MATTHEW C. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PERMITTING SHAREHOLDERS' INSPECTION OF CORPORATE RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-06-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint ( (1st)); Filed by Core Strategic Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Bashir Hajjar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Core Strategic Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Bashir Hajjar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Robert G. Klein, Esq., State Bar No. 128550 LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT G. KLEIN 8383 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 510

Beverly Hills, California 90211

Telephone: (323) 653-3900 Facsimile: (213) 947-1441

FILED

Sur~~ Tourn of - et COL; Jv of Lne Al mgleo

CEC 65 757

Sherri F) Caner, exacuuve Olicor/Cle By Deput

Rau! Sanchez

Attorneys for Defendants/Cross Complainants ACG Industries, Inc.; Howard Misle; Peter Seltzer

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

BASHIR HAJJAR, and CORE STRATEGIC INVESTMENTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company,

Plaintiffs, VSs.

ACG INDUSTRIES, INC., a Nevada corporation, HOWARD MISLE, and PETER SELTZER, and DOES 1 through 10.

Defendants.

ACG INDUSTRIES, INC. a corporation, HOWARD MISLE, an individual; PETER SELTZER, an individual,

Cross Complainants, Vs. BASHIR HAJJAR, an individual; CORE STRATEGIC INVESTMENTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company;

ALEXANDER GAREEB, an individual; and ROES 1 through 50.

Cross Defendants.

Nt e e Nnart et et e’ st e “oaet’ “aus’ ot s’ e e’ e e s’ o o’ e e’ e’

CASE NO. BC658951

Hon. Robert L. Hess/Dept. 24 Action Filed: April 21, 2017

OPPOSITION BY CROSS

COMPLAINANTS ACG INDUSTRIES,

HOWARD MISLE AND PETE SELTZER TO ALEXANDER GAREEB'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

Date: January 22, 2018 Time: 8:30 a.m. Dept.: 24

Opposition By Cross Complainants Acg Industries, Howard Misle And Pete Seltzer To Alexander Gareeb's

Demurrer To The Second Amended Cross Complaint

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Metal Recycling Services is a litigant

Latest cases where ACG INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RECYCLING SPECIALISTS, INC. a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLEIN, ROBERT G.