This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:31:46 (UTC).

BAS ENGINEERING, INC. VS SWINERTON BUILDERS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 BAS ENGINEERING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SWINERTON BUILDERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2163

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAS ENGINEERING INC.

Defendants

BROADWAY ELITE LLC

SWINERTON BUILDERS

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLBROOK JR. E SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

BAKER MARK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/31/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Lis Pendens

9/9/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/18/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

General Denial

12/9/2021: General Denial

Case Management Statement

12/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/20/2021: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BAS ENGINEERING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROADWAY ELITE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SWINERTON BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAKER MARK