Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 08:44:42 (UTC).

BARTLETT, THEODORE D. - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 BARTLETT, THEODORE D - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7182

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BARTLETT BRYAN H.

PATTERSON BROOKE BARTLETT

BARTLETT IDA LUCILLE

BARTLETT BRETT E.

Not Classified By Court

BARTLETT THEODORE D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COOPER MARLENE SESSION

 

Court Documents

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

1/28/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Order

2/3/2021: Order

Minute Order

1/19/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - Supp to Ptn to Determine Succession to RP

1/12/2021: Supplement - Supp to Ptn to Determine Succession to RP

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

9/10/2020: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial) - Petition to Determine Succession of Real Property (Initial)

8/31/2020: Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial) - Petition to Determine Succession of Real Property (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial) filed on August 31, 2020 by Brett E. Bartlett, Bryan H. Bartlett, Ida Lucille Bartlett. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supp to Ptn to Determine Succession to RP ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial) (Petition to Determine Succession of Real Property (Initial) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOPER MARLENE SESSION