This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2019 at 00:25:10 (UTC).

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS, LLP VS MASOUD SAFAEIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER WEISS, LLP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MASOUD SAFAEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0094

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS LLP

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT AN ADMINISTRATIVE AGENCY OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY

SAFAEIN MASOUD

TABASSIAN MITRA

GURSEY SCHNEIDER LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS LAWRENCE DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

WRIGHT ANDREW

BAUER ALEXANDRA MARTINA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

12/4/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION FOR (1) DISCHARGE OF PLAINTIFF; (2) PAYMENT OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS; (3) DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS FUNDS; AND (4) DISMISSAL OF ACTION; ORDER THEREON

10/21/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION FOR (1) DISCHARGE OF PLAINTIFF; (2) PAYMENT OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS; (3) DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS FUNDS; AND (4) DISMISSAL OF ACTION; ORDER THEREON

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/10/2019

9/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/10/2019

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/30/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT TO THE COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

5/30/2019: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT TO THE COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

Case Management Statement

6/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

2/20/2019: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint Complaint in Interpleader

1/29/2019: Complaint - Complaint Complaint in Interpleader

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/29/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/30/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Entire Action); Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketStipulation for (1) Discharge of Plaintiff; (2) Payment of Plaintiff's Attorneys' Fees and Costs; (3) Distribution of Surplus Funds; and (4) Dismissal of Action; Order Thereon; Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docketat 11:43 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Lawrence Daniel Harris (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gursey Schneider LLP, a limited liability partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint (Complaint in Interpleader); Filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GURSEY SCHNEIDER LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS, LAWRENCE