This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 06:06:39 (UTC).

BARONHR, INC. VS MEDINA VILLEGAS, REYNALDO D.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 BARONHR, INC filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against MEDINA VILLEGAS, REYNALDO D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WARREN, JEANMARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4430

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WARREN, JEANMARIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARONHR INC.

Respondent

MEDINA VILLEGAS REYNALDO D.

Other

MORALES MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HOERAUF GRAHAM M.

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8/19/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

8/19/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

8/19/2021: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Minute Order

9/9/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/9/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

10/4/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 13, Warren, Jeanmarie, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 13, Warren, Jeanmarie, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less