This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 18:18:04 (UTC).

BARNETT, CHARLOTTE - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 BARNETT, CHARLOTTE - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5975

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARNETT GREGORY NEAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAPEDIS JACK MARSHALL

 

Court Documents

Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. - Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

12/30/2020: Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. - Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

12/21/2020: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

Order - Deposit Funds

12/21/2020: Order - Deposit Funds

Minute Order

12/15/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

7/28/2020: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) - PROBATE CASE COVERSHEET

7/28/2020: Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) - PROBATE CASE COVERSHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketReceipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. (Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (PROBATE CASE COVERSHEET ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAPEDIS JACK MARSHALL