This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 05:16:33 (UTC).

BARMAN ASADI VS WILSHIRE 5TH, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 BARMAN ASADI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILSHIRE 5TH, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2246

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASADI BARMAN

Defendants

1-20 DOES

WILSHIRE 5TH INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN MICHAEL P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2024
  • Hearing11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BARMAN ASADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BARMAN ASADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BARMAN ASADI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN MICHAEL PAUL