This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 01:42:25 (UTC).

BARIAA GHRAOUI KUSEZ VS PRIME PARK LABREA TITLEHOLDER, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 BARIAA GHRAOUI KUSEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PRIME PARK LABREA TITLEHOLDER, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7001

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUSEZ BARIAA GHRAOUI

Defendants

PLB MANAGEMENT LLC.

PRIME PARK LABREA TITLEHOLDER LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN J.

Defendant Attorney

KAHN DAVID JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/24/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2024
  • Hearing07/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Hearing01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Hearing01/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BARIAA GHRAOUI KUSEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BARIAA GHRAOUI KUSEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PRIME PARK LABREA TITLEHOLDER, LLC. (Defendant); PLB MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BARIAA GHRAOUI KUSEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BARIAA GHRAOUI KUSEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BARIAA GHRAOUI KUSEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLB MANAGEMENT A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Prime/Park Labrea Titleholder, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHN DAVID J.