This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2022 at 19:15:24 (UTC).

BARDO GONZALEZ VS NUMERO UNO ACQUISITIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 BARDO GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NUMERO UNO ACQUISITIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0451

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ BARDO

Defendant

NUMERO UNO ACQUISITIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAMANN DAVID

Defendant Attorney

LEON LUCIO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/12/2021: PI General Order

PI General Order

11/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE: PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE: PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE: PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE: PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/10/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/10/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2024
  • Hearing10/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • Hearing04/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NUMERO UNO ACQUISITIONS, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by NUMERO UNO ACQUISITIONS, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BARDO GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order Re: PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order Re: PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BARDO GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BARDO GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BARDO GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less