This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 00:33:27 (UTC).

BARBARA WILLIAMS VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Case Summary

On 04/12/2018 BARBARA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA MONICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1903

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WILLIAMS BARBARA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

SANTA MONICA CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

VAHDAT G. AMY ESQ.

VAHDAT GHAZAL AMY ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LANE DILG CITY ATTORNEY

BROWN SAMANTHA STORY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...)

1/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

1/24/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA S. BROWN

1/24/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA S. BROWN

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION; DECLARATION OF G. AMY VAHDAT, ESQ.; [PROP

3/4/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION; DECLARATION OF G. AMY VAHDAT, ESQ.; [PROP

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO REOPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES

3/9/2020: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO REOPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

Notice of Ruling

4/22/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY)

6/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY) OF 06/24/2020

6/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY) OF 06/24/2020

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT OFF AS SET FORTH HEREIN FOR GOOD CAUSE

7/28/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT OFF AS SET FORTH HEREIN FOR GOOD CAUSE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AS SET FORTH HEREIN FOR GOOD CAUSE

12/11/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AS SET FORTH HEREIN FOR GOOD CAUSE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/2/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/9/2018: DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

4/12/2018: SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ICIV. CODE 33331 FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AGAINST PUBLIC ENTITIES AND EMPLOYEES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/12/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ICIV. CODE 33331 FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AGAINST PUBLIC ENTITIES AND EMPLOYEES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • Hearing07/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Hearing07/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Continue Trial And Extend Discovery Cut-Off As Set Forth Herein For Good Cause); Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT OFF AS SET FORTH HEREIN FOR GOOD CAUSE); Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Barbara Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Barbara Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Barbara Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ICIV. CODE 33331 FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AGAINST PUBLIC ENTITIES AND EMPLOYEES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701903    Hearing Date: June 24, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

barbara williams,

Plaintiff,

v.

city of santa monica, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC701903

Hearing Date: June 24, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

defendant’S MOTION TO re-open discovery

The Court previously continued the trial date to August 24, 2020, by way of Defendant’s ex parte application, but the Court did not extend the discovery and motions cut-off. (See St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company v. Superior Court (1984) 156 Cal.App.3d 82, 85.) Now, Defendant move to continue the discovery and motions cut-off, which Plaintiff opposes. Plaintiff stipulated in writing to continue the trial date to August 24, 2020, and to extend all related discovery deadlines based on the new trial date. (See Declaration of Samantha S. Brown, Exhibit A.) That stipulation binds Plaintiff. (Palmer v. City of Oakland (1978) 86 Cal.App.3d 39, 44.) Accordingly, the motion is granted as stipulation. Independent of that stipulation, the Court finds good cause to extend the discovery and motions cut-off dates.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion to extend the discovery and motions cut-off dates are granted. These dates shall be based on the new trial date. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: June 24, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC701903    Hearing Date: March 17, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

barbara williams,

Plaintiff,

v.

city of santa monica, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC701903

Hearing Date: March 17, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

defendant’S MOTION TO re-open discovery

The Court previously continued the trial date to August 24, 2020, by way of Defendant’s ex parte application, but the Court did not extend the discovery and motions cut-off. (See St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company v. Superior Court (1984) 156 Cal.App.3d 82, 85.) Now, Defendant move to continue the discovery and motions cut-off, which Plaintiff opposes. Plaintiff stipulated in writing to continue the trial date to August 24, 2020, and to extend all related discovery deadlines based on the new trial date. (See Declaration of Samantha S. Brown, Exhibit A.) That stipulation binds Plaintiff. (Palmer v. City of Oakland (1978) 86 Cal.App.3d 39, 44.) Accordingly, the motion is granted as stipulation. Independent of that stipulation, the Court finds good cause to extend the discovery and motions cut-off dates.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion to extend the discovery and motions cut-off dates are granted. These dates shall be based on the new trial date. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: March 17, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA MONICA CITY OF is a litigant