This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 08:04:49 (UTC).

BARBARA TAYLOR VS PROMISE HOSPITAL EAST LA ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 BARBARA TAYLOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROMISE HOSPITAL EAST LA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE, ERNEST HIROSHIGE, ROBERT S. DRAPER and GAIL FEUER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0984

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

ERNEST HIROSHIGE

ROBERT S. DRAPER

GAIL FEUER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TAYLOR BARBARA

Defendants and Respondents

SOURTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL

PRASAD RAJ DOCTOR

COUNTRY VILLA EAST TERRACE

DOES 1 TO 100

PROMISE HOSPITAL EAST LA

EAST TERRACE REHABILITATION & WELLNESS

PRASAD DOCTOR RAJ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KIRAMIJYAN ARMEN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

CREASON & AARVIG LLP

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

KATZ MARC ESQ.

HESTER CECILLE L. ESQ.

HESTER CECILLE LOUISE

BIRTJA MICHELLE ALYSSA

ALEXANDER ROCCO JOSEPH

CHRISTOPOULOS LYNNETTE AVANESS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/8/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT PROMISE HOSPITAL OF EAST LOS ANGELES, LP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/21/2018: DEFENDANT PROMISE HOSPITAL OF EAST LOS ANGELES, LP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/21/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/25/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Case Management Statement

10/3/2018: Case Management Statement

Motion for Summary Judgment

10/9/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration

10/9/2018: Declaration

Declaration

10/9/2018: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

10/9/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

11/14/2018: Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Declaration

2/5/2019: Declaration

Opposition

2/5/2019: Opposition

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

2/6/2019: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Minute Order

2/6/2019: Minute Order

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

3/21/2019: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

Notice

4/18/2019: Notice

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by SOURTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by COUNTRY VILLA EAST TERRACE (Defendant); East Terrace Rehabilitation & Wellness (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketOrder (Ruling Re: Defendant East Terrace Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP's Motion to Stay Entire Case); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Plaintiff's Non-Opposition to Motion to Stay); Filed by COUNTRY VILLA EAST TERRACE (Defendant); East Terrace Rehabilitation & Wellness (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (ON MOTION FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, RAJENDRA PRASAD, M.D.); Filed by Rajendra Prasad, M.D. Erroneously Sued As DOCTOR RAJ PRASAD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT RAJENDRA PRASAD, M.D.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
207 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by PROMISE HOSPITAL EAST LA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by BARBARA TAYLOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT PROMISE HOSPITAL OF EAST LOS ANGELES, LP'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by PROMISE HOSPITAL EAST LA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by PROMISE HOSPITAL EAST LA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT PROMISE HOSPITAL OF EAST LOS ANGELES, LP'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ELDER ABUSE AND NEGLECT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BARBARA TAYLOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST TERRACE REHABILITATION & WELLNESS is a litigant

Latest cases where PROMISE HOSPITAL OF EAST LA L.P is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTRY VILLA EAST L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL is a litigant