This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 11:45:50 (UTC).

BARBARA LEE VS JUNG MI WANG

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 BARBARA LEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUNG MI WANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0420

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE BARBARA

Defendant

WANG JUNG MI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSOLO THOMAS VINCENT

Defendant Attorney

BAHARVAR GABRIELLA

Other Attorneys

MARCUS GERALD LEE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/16/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/16/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

11/6/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2023
  • Hearing10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Hearing04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Hearing04/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Barbara Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jung Mi Wang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jung Mi Wang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jung Mi Wang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Barbara Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Barbara Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Barbara Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Barbara Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE