Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 09:01:43 (UTC).

BARBARA DOSS VS COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 BARBARA DOSS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3888

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOSS BARBARA

Defendant

COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOKER ROBERT L.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/28/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2024
  • Hearing04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Barbara Doss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Barbara Doss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Barbara Doss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Barbara Doss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOKER II ROBERT L. ESQ.