Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 05:01:35 (UTC).

BARBARA BOLTON VS YOUNG JAE PARK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 BARBARA BOLTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YOUNG JAE PARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7655

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOLTON BARBARA

Defendants

KIM DAVID SEONDGDO

SOOK HYAE

PARK YOUNG JAE

PARK SUN YOUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDVER ALINA

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/22/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/28/2021: Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/30/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/30/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/30/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/30/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Complaint

2/26/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/26/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

PI General Order

3/17/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2024
  • Hearing02/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • Hearing08/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMotion for Leave (MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (To First Amended Complaint); Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BARBARA BOLTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDVER ALINA