This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2019 at 12:09:03 (UTC).

BARBARA BERND VS RADFORD CABINETS, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 BARBARA BERND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RADFORD CABINETS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN C. YEP and ASHFAQ G. CHOWDHURY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6976

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN C. YEP

ASHFAQ G. CHOWDHURY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERND BARBARA

Defendants

RADFORD CABINETS INC.

BUDGET EQUIPMENT RENTALS

RADFORD BRIAN ALLEN

BUDGET TRUCK RENTAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KISTLER PAUL M.

Defendant Attorneys

KRUPPE MICHAEL A.

HART JR. JAMES P.

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

3/29/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Reply

7/23/2018: Reply

Minute Order

7/26/2018: Minute Order

Notice

7/27/2018: Notice

Minute Order

8/3/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

9/21/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Unknown

10/12/2018: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

11/14/2018: Request for Dismissal

Memorandum

7/11/2018: Memorandum

Declaration

7/11/2018: Declaration

Other -

7/11/2018: Other -

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

12/11/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

12/11/2017: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/11/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Proof of Service

10/6/2017: Proof of Service

Other -

9/13/2017: Other -

Other -

9/13/2017: Other -

Complaint

8/9/2017: Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by BARBARA BERND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A22, Ashfaq G. Chowdhury, Presiding; Unknown event - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Trial) of 10/12/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by BARBARA BERND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department A22; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2017
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by BARBARA BERND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Amended Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Amended Civil Cover & Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Summons; Filed by BARBARA BERND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Summons; Filed by BARBARA BERND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by BARBARA BERND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUDGET TRUCK RENTAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HART JAMES P. JR. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUPPE MICHAEL A. ESQ.