This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2023 at 00:06:42 (UTC).

BARBARA BENSON, DECEASED, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST DANIEL BENSON, ET AL. VS BRIUS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 BARBARA BENSON, DECEASED, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST DANIEL BENSON, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRIUS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONALD F. FRANK and MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6510

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RONALD F. FRANK

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARBARA BENSON DECEASED BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST DANIEL BENSON

BENSON DANIEL

Defendants

BOARDWALK WEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

BRIUS LLC

BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO.

CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER LLC

DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC

DRIFTWOOD-LET LLC

RECHNITZ CITRUS GP

RECHNITZ CORE GP

RECHNITZ SHLOMO

ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC

ROCKPORT HEALTHCARE SUPPORT SERVICES LLC

SOL HEALTHCARE LLC

SYTR REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALENTINE KIMBERLY

Defendant Attorney

COWDREY SEAN D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

10/20/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

Notice of Ruling

10/20/2023: Notice of Ruling

Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

10/17/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

10/17/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

10/17/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

Reply (name extension) Reply to Opposition

10/16/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply to Opposition

Reply (name extension) Reply to Opposition

10/16/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply to Opposition

Reply (name extension) Reply to Opposition

10/16/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply to Opposition

Reply (name extension) Reply to Opposition

10/16/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply to Opposition

Reply (name extension) Reply PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PMK DEPOSITIONS

10/16/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PMK DEPOSITIONS

Minute Order Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

10/12/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

10/12/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

10/12/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

10/12/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

10/12/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of nonreceipt

Opposition (name extension) Opposition DEFENDANT SYTRS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, TO DEFENDANT SYTR REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC

10/12/2023: Opposition (name extension) Opposition DEFENDANT SYTRS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, TO DEFENDANT SYTR REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC

Opposition (name extension) Opposition DEFENDANT RECHNITZ CORE GPS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, TO RECHNITZ CORE GP

10/12/2023: Opposition (name extension) Opposition DEFENDANT RECHNITZ CORE GPS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, TO RECHNITZ CORE GP

Opposition (name extension) Opposition DEFENDANT BOARDWALK'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, TO BOARDWALK WEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC; DECLARATION OF SEAN D. COWDREY

10/12/2023: Opposition (name extension) Opposition DEFENDANT BOARDWALK'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, TO BOARDWALK WEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC; DECLARATION OF SEAN D. COWDREY

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/25/2024

Hearing03/25/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2024

Hearing03/15/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2023

Hearing12/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Brius, LLC (Defendant); Brius Management Co. (Defendant); Driftwood Healthcare & Wellness Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
184 More Docket Entries
02/22/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Barbara Benson, Deceased, by and through her Successor in Interest Daniel Benson (Plaintiff); Daniel Benson (Plaintiff); As to: Brius, LLC (Defendant); Brius Management Co. (Defendant); Shlomo Rechnitz (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Barbara Benson, Deceased, by and through her Successor in Interest Daniel Benson (Plaintiff); Daniel Benson (Plaintiff); As to: Brius, LLC (Defendant); Brius Management Co. (Defendant); Shlomo Rechnitz (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketDeclaration Successor In Interest; Filed by: Barbara Benson, Deceased, by and through her Successor in Interest Daniel Benson (Plaintiff); Daniel Benson (Plaintiff); As to: Brius, LLC (Defendant); Brius Management Co. (Defendant); Shlomo Rechnitz (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6510 Hearing Date: March 13, 2023 Dept: 8

Tentative Ruling

HEARING DATE: March 13, 2023

CASE NUMBER: 22TRCV06510

CASE NAME: Barbara Benson, Deceased, by and through her successor in interest Daniel Benson; and Daniel Benson, individually v. Brius LLC, et al.

MOVING PARTY: Specially appearing Defendant, Shlomo Rechnitz

RESPONDING PARTY: Plaintiff, Barbara Benson, Deceased, by and through her successor in interest Daniel Benson; and Daniel Benson, individually

TRIAL DATE: August 22, 2023

MOTION: (1) Motion to Quash

Tentative Rulings: (1) Grant, but if defense counsel will not agree to accept service on Mr. Rechnitz’ behalf, the Court will consider a motion to serve by publication in light of plaintiff’s reasonably diligent efforts to effect service at multiple addresses they found for him

I. BACKGROUND

A. Factual

On February 22, 2022, Plaintiff Barbara Benson, Deceased, by and through her successor in interest Daniel Benson; and Daniel Benson, individually (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants, Bruis LLC; Bruis Management Co.; Driftwood Healthcare & Wellness Center, LC; Citrus GP; Boardwalk West Financial services, LLC; Driftwood-Let, LLC; SYTR Real Estate Holdings, LLC; Rockport Healthcare Support Service, LLC; Rockport Administrative Services, LLC; SOL Healthcare LLC; Rechnitz Core GP; and DOES 1 through 150, inclusive. The Complaint alleged causes of action for: (1) Negligence/Willful Misconduct; (2) Elder Abuse and Neglect; (3) Violation of Patients’ Bill of Rights; and (4) Wrongful Death.

Specially Appearing Defendant, Shlomo Rechnitz now files a Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint claiming that he was not served with the summons and complaint

B. Procedural

On August 1, 2022, Specially Appearing Defendant, Shlomo Rechnitz (“Rechnitz”) filed this Motion to Quash service of summons for improper service of process. On February 27, 2023, Plaintiff filed an opposition to Defendant’s Motion to Quash Service of Summons

II. ANALYSIS

A. Legal Standard

“When a defendant challenges the court’s personal jurisdiction on the ground of improper service of process ‘the burden is on the plaintiff to prove the existence of jurisdiction by proving, inter alia, the facts requisite to an effective service.’” (Summers v. McClanahan (2006) 140 Cal.App.4th 403, 413.) A proof of service containing a declaration from a registered process server invokes a presumption of valid service. (See American Express Centurion Bank v. Zara (2011) 199 Cal.App.4th 383, 390; see also Evid. Code 647.) This presumption is rebuttable. (See id.) The party seeking to defeat service of process must present sufficient evidence to show that the service did not take place as stated. (See Palm Property Investments, LLC v. Yadegar (2011) 194 Cal.App.4th 1419, 1428; cf. People v. Chavez (1991) 231 Cal.App.3d 1471, 1483 [“If some fact be presumed, the opponent of that fact bears the burden of producing or going forward with evidence sufficient to overcome or rebut the presumed fact.”].) Merely denying service took place without more is insufficient to overcome the presumption. (See Yadegar, supra, 194 Cal.App.4th at 1428.)

B. Discussion

Defendant Rechnitz asserts that Plaintiff’s proof of service and complaint purports that he was served by substituted service on July 7, 2022, by serving a “Jane Doe, Person in Charge” at 7223 Beverly Blvd., Suite 205, Los Angeles, California, and thereafter mailed the summons, complaint, and various other documents to the same address on July 8, 2022. However, Defendant Rechnitz argues that for substituted service on an individual defendant to be valid, the process served must have first made a good faith effort at personal service on the individual defendant and provide a declaration of reasonable diligence pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 415.20(b). Additionally, Defendant Rechnitz notes in his declaration that the address listed on the proof, 7223 Beverly Blvd., Suite 205, Los Angeles, California is not his home or workplace. (Rechnitz Decl., 3-4.)

In Plaintiff’s opposition, Plaintiff argues that Defendant Rechnitz was initially served via substitute service on May 9, 2022 at the address of co-defendant Driftwood Healthcare & Wellness Center, LLC, the skilled nursing facility Rechnitz is alleged to own and operate. (Declaration of Joseph F. Fighera, 2; Exhibit A, Proof of Service; Complaint, 19-24.) Plaintiffs further noted that in light of the initial arguments raised by defense counsel in relation to the initial service upon Defendant Rechnitz and in hopes of avoiding unnecessary law and motion, Plaintiff elected to effectuate service on Defendant Rechnitz again, and in doing so, attempted service at his usual place of business, 7223 Beverly Boulevard, Suite 205, Los Angeles, California 90036. (Fighera Decl., 4.) Plaintiff further notes that it attempted to effectuate personal service on Defendant Rechnitz at that address on three occasions, June 27, 2022, June 28, 2022, and July 7, 2022. (Declaration of Mark McCabe, attached hereto, at 8-10.) Plaintiff contends that on the first two occasions, there was no response from anyone inside, however on July 7, 2022, upon gaining access to the building, McCabe arrived with the door open and a number of people inside (McCabe Decl., 10, 11.) The process server announced he was serving important legal documents. (McCabe Decl., 11.) The woman allegedly took the documents without hesitation or reservation. (McCabe Decl., 11.) The next day, McCabe served those same documents to Defendant Rechnitz at the same address via U.S. Mail, as reflected in the Proof of Service. (Exhibit G, Proof of Service.)

Plaintiff argues that service upon Rechnitz was proper pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 415.20(b). However, Plaintiff also notes that should this Court determine service upon Defendant Rechnitz was defective in any manner, Plaintiff has asked that he be allowed to remedy any issues related to service. Plaintiff also concedes that the proof of service does not have a declaration of due diligence, but has offered to file an amended proof of service with the Declaration of Diligence attached.

On this record, particularly with Mr. Rechnitz’ declaration providing proof that he neither lives nor works at either of the addresses Plaintiff’s investigation indicated he might be found, the Motion to Quash is granted. However, the Court encourages the parties to stipulate to accepting service on Mr. Rechnitz’ behalf so the case can move forward on the merits. In similar circumstances, with the evidence of due diligence and attempts at service on multiple occasions at addresses plaintiff’s investigation reflected as being ones where Mr. Rechnitz might be found, the Court might favorably consider granting a future motion for service by publication since other parties who have appeared in this case appear to be represented by the same counsel as Mr. Rechnitz.