This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2023 at 06:07:29 (UTC).

BARBARA ANDREWS VS MARK JUDAKEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2017 BARBARA ANDREWS filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against MARK JUDAKEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL M. CROWLEY, THERESA M. TRABER and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6132

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

THERESA M. TRABER

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREWS BARBARA

Defendants

JUDAKEN MARK

GARTH STREET LLC

KALNEL GARDENS LLC

MOKO MANAGEMENT LLC

COCAL REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS LLP

NISSAN WOODWORKS LLC

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

NISSAN WOODWORKS LLC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVAK SEAN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

GIANNETTO ALEX M

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment

9/27/2021: Default Judgment

Notice - NOTICE P NTC OF SETTLEMENT AS TO D NISSAN

9/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE P NTC OF SETTLEMENT AS TO D NISSAN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

3/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/18/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. PREMISES LIABILITY; 2. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

12/8/2017: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. PREMISES LIABILITY; 2. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SUBMIT A DEF...)

5/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SUBMIT A DEF...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 06/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 06/29/2021

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

7/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DOE DEFENDANTS AND ENTRY...)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DOE DEFENDANTS AND ENTRY...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

9/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 09/27/2021

9/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 09/27/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/11/2022

3/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/11/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT

3/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING AND INDEX OF EXHIBITS

6/2/2020: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING AND INDEX OF EXHIBITS

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/10/2022

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Submit a Def...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Submit a Default Judgment or Judgments against Defendants Cocal Real Estate Investments, LLP, Garth Street, LLC, and Moko Management, LLC scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 05/10/2022; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2022

DocketNotice of OSC re Dismissal for Failure to File Default; Filed by: Barbara Andrews (Plaintiff); As to: Garth Street, LLC (Defendant); Mark Judaken (Defendant); Kalnel Gardens, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Submit a Default Judgment or Judgments against Defendants Cocal Real Estate Investments, LLP, Garth Street, LLC, and Moko Management, LLC scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/11/2022; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021

DocketUpdated -- Judgment amended on 09/27/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Amended

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021

DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Andrews, Barbara against Defendant Judaken, Mark and Defendant Kalnel Gardens, LLC on the Complaint filed by BARBARA ANDREWS on 12/08/2017 for the principal amount of $559,354.61 for a total of $559,354.61.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021

DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Default Judgment)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Default Judgment) of 09/27/2021; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
140 More Docket Entries
02/16/2018

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2017

DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 05/24/19 at 10:00 am Dennis J. Landin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2017

DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 06/10/19 at 8:30 am Dennis J. Landin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2017

DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 12/08/20 at 8:30 am Dennis J. Landin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2017

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2017

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6132    Hearing Date: January 23, 2020    Dept: 28

The court would like to hear argument on this matter.