This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 00:09:13 (UTC).

BARBARA A. CONTRERAS VS ROZCOR INC

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 BARBARA A CONTRERAS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROZCOR INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OKI, DAN THOMAS, DAN THOMAS OKI and GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0113

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OKI, DAN THOMAS

DAN THOMAS OKI

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CONTRERAS BARBARA A.

CONTRERAS HECTOR L.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Yet Classified

ROZCOR INC

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

MARMOLEJO ALBERT M.

JIMENEZ ARMANDO R.

AL-MAR CONSTRUCTION

DAVIS TIMOTHY J.

A REMOLDING INC

OROZCO ROBERT

AMERICAN CONTRARORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

MARMOLEJO ALBERT M. DBA AL-MAR CONSTRUCTION

ROZCOR INC.

A REMODELING INC.

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMASSON CHRISTY LEE

VON ESCH IV ESQ. ROBERT A.

VONESCH ROBERT ALEXANDER IV

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PICKARD III ESQ. DAVID W.

SOSA CARLOS

BROWN ESQ. A. SCOTT

BROWN AARON SCOTT

SOSA CARLOS EDUARDO

 

Court Documents

Order

7/11/2019: Order

Declaration

3/1/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/1/2019: Declaration

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

3/1/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

3/1/2019: Separate Statement

Minute Order

2/14/2019: Minute Order

Summons

3/13/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/14/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document

4/10/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/11/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/11/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/15/2018: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

7/26/2018: Case Management Statement

Order

11/5/2018: Order

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

10/31/2018: Case Management Statement

Miscellaneous

7/5/2018: Miscellaneous

Miscellaneous

7/5/2018: Miscellaneous

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Hearingat 13:30 PM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Hearing - Other (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Barbara A. Contreras (Plaintiff); Hector L. Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Hector L. Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketOrder (Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Barbara A. Contreras (Plaintiff); Hector L. Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Barbara A. Contreras (Plaintiff); Hector L. Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketOrder (to Show Cause Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Barbara A. Contreras (Plaintiff); Hector L. Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: KC070113    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: J

HEARING DATE: Tuesday, December 17, 2019

NOTICE: OK

RE: Contreras v. Rozcor, Inc., et al. (KC070113)

______________________________________________________________________________

 

Plaintiffs/Cross-Defendants Barbara A. Contreras’ and Hector L. Contreras’ MOTION

FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ROBERT OROZCO’S COMPLIANCE WITH

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION AND SUBPOENA

Responding Party: None (unopposed, as of 12/6/19, 3:58 p.m.; due 12/4/19)

 

Tentative Ruling

Plaintiffs/Cross-Defendants Barbara A. Contreras’ and Hector L. Contreras’ Motion for

an Order Compelling Robert Orozco’s Compliance with Notice of Deposition and

Subpoena is DENIED.

Background

Plaintiffs Barbara A. Contreras (“Barbara”) and Hector L. Contreras (“Hector”) (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) entered into construction contracts with defendants. Plaintiffs allege that defendants did not have valid contractor’s licenses, which caused the City of Baldwin Park to issue a stop notice on the work. On March 13, 2018, Plaintiffs filed a complaint, asserting causes of action against Defendants Rozcor, Inc. (“Rozcor”), Robert Orozco (“Orozco”), A Remodeling, Inc. (“ARI”), Armando R. Jimenez, Timothy J. Davis, Albert M. Marmolejo dba Al-Mar Construction (“Marmolejo”), Wesco Insurance Company (“Wesco”), American Contractors Indemnity Company (“ACIC”) and Does 1-50 for:

  1. Violation of the Contractors State License Law and Disgorgement Under Business & Professions Code § 7031(b)
  2. Contractor’s State License Bond
  3. Breach of Written Contract

On April 19, 2018, Plaintiffs dismissed ACIC without prejudice. On May 18, 2018, Marmolejo filed his cross-complaint, asserted a cause of action against Plaintiffs and Roes 1-10 for:

  1. Breach of Contract

On August 6, 2018, Rozcor’s and Orozco’s defaults were entered. On October 31, 2018, Plaintiffs dismissed Wesco, without prejudice.

The Final Status Conference is set for July 6, 2020. Trial is set for July 14, 2020.

Discussion

Plaintiffs/Cross-Defendants’ motion is summarily DENIED. Orozco is a party defendant.

Orozco’s default was entered on August 6, 2018 and has not been set aside, to date.

Plaintiffs/Cross-Defendants have failed to provide the court with any legal authority which

permits them to compel a defaulted defendant’s deposition.