This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2020 at 08:57:04 (UTC).

BARBARA A. COHEN VS OREN ABUTBUL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 BARBARA A COHEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OREN ABUTBUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0290

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN BARBARA A.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BITTON PERRI Z.

ABUTBUL OREN

U.S. VETERANS HOME SERVICES INC.

CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

HANOCK TRACE S.

TSH SALES & CONSULTING INC. DBA TSH CONSTRUCTION AND DESIGN A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLFE TODD MITCHELL

WOLFE TODD M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BUCHANAN NATASHA KAMDAR

NOUDEL YOSSI

CORNELIUS ALEXANDRE

JONES TODD A.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/6/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

4/6/2020: Answer

Notice of Ruling

4/10/2020: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/27/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Application for Publication

2/27/2020: Application for Publication

Substitution of Attorney

3/5/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint

11/13/2019: Amended Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/8/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

8/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

5/6/2019: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/8/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Application for Publication - APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO PUBLISH

3/8/2019: Application for Publication - APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO PUBLISH

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/15/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • Hearing08/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Barbara A. Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Barbara A. Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Barbara A. Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Barbara A. Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Wesco Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by TSH Sales & Consulting, Inc. dba TSH Construction and Design, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant); American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Barbara A. Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Barbara A. Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Barbara A. Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.