This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 02:28:42 (UTC).

BAR LEVKOVITZ VS SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 BAR LEVKOVITZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1540

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVKOVITZ BAR

Defendants

CASA DE CADILLAC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A SUBARU SHERMAN OAKS;

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION;

CASA DE CADILLAC DBA SUBARU SHERMAN OAKS

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALOUSTIAN HARRY S

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/10/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

11/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • Hearing11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bar Levkovitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Bar Levkovitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bar Levkovitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bar Levkovitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bar Levkovitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASA DE CADILLAC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BUICK GMC SHERMAN OAKS is a litigant

Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALOUSTIAN HARRY S. ESQ.