This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2020 at 03:02:48 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. VS SUSIE S AHN

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SUSIE S AHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0044

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

AHN SUSIE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS EMILY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/13/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • Hearing07/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.