This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 18:45:03 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS SANDRA L ADAMS

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANDRA L ADAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1276

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

ADAMS SANDRA L

Torrance, CA 90503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WACHTMAN JEREMY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

11/18/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/18/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request for Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANDRA L ADAMS (Defendant); Service Date: 12/01/2022; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANDRA L ADAMS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANDRA L ADAMS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: SANDRA L ADAMS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from SANDRA L ADAMS (Defendant) to SANDRA L ADAMS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request for Entry of Default scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WACHTMAN JEREMY