This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 14:04:17 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS NUNE KHACHATRYAN

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NUNE KHACHATRYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0170

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

KHACHATRYAN NUNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLEEZER KRISTEN

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/6/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service - No Service

2/18/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • Hearing07/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Hearing07/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.