This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2020 at 09:10:25 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS LIDA YOUSEFI

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIDA YOUSEFI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0167

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

YOUSEFI LIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLEEZER KRISTEN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/17/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service - No Service

2/28/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

2/24/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Proof of Service - No Service

2/18/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.