Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 03:03:54 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS JEFF FEHER

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEFF FEHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9964

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

FEHER JEFF

Los Angeles, CA 90027-5902

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

7/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/28/2021

6/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/28/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

6/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Declaration - DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

5/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/10/2021

5/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/10/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

3/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • Hearing08/05/2021 at 10:35 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reProof of Service) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 3:28 PM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 1:50 PM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (in Opposition to Order to Show Cause); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard