This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2019 at 10:26:16 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS JAMES D FITZGERALD JR.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMES D FITZGERALD JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7512

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

FITZGERALD JAMES D. JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYUN ESTER E.

TANG JASON W.

 

Court Documents

Summons

10/24/2017: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

10/24/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

10/24/2017: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/24/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/24/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

11/6/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-01-09 00:00:00

1/9/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-01-09 00:00:00

Case Management Statement

3/16/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-26 00:00:00

3/26/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-26 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-18 00:00:00

6/18/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-18 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

6/25/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-08-27 00:00:00

8/27/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-08-27 00:00:00

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/19/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal -

10/4/2018: Request for Dismissal -

Notice of Continuance -

9/19/2018: Notice of Continuance -

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (Order to Show Cause) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketRequest (for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Entire Action pursuant to CCP 664.6.); Filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (HEARING 10/01/18 IS CONTINUED TO 12/18/2018; TO: ESTER HYUN, ESQ. ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NCGD, Ralph C. Hofer, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OFSETTLEMENT;) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNotice (of osc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.