This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2020 at 07:08:47 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS GEORGE HYOWON KIM

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEORGE HYOWON KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0164

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

KIM GEORGE HYOWON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLEEZER KRISTEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/22/2020

5/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/06/2020

4/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/06/2020

Proof of Personal Service

2/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service - No Service

2/14/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • Hearing08/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.