This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 01:14:33 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS. FRANK QUN MIAO

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANK QUN MIAO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8428

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

MIAO FRANK QUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SUTTELL HAMMER & WHITE APC

PATTERSON ERIN E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/19/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

4/19/2018: Summons

Legacy Document

4/19/2018: Legacy Document

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice

4/19/2018: Notice

Legacy Document

5/23/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

7/18/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/5/2018: Minute Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/19/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

9/19/2018: Answer

Minute Order

9/19/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

6/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice (OSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patterson, Erin E