Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 10:58:00 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS EDWARDO INIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDWARDO INIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0200

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

INIGUEZ EDWARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE FLINT C

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • Hearing08/02/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HARRIS & ZIDE - FLINT C. ZIDE