Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 10:25:23 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS BRIAN CHOI

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIAN CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2418

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

CHOI BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JERRY WANG ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/27/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

10/27/2017: Complaint

Summons

10/27/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document

2/15/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

2/20/2018: Legacy Document

Request for Dismissal

12/11/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/26/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

12/31/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/16/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause re: Failure to File Request for Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Summons; Filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WANG, JERRY