This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 05:33:48 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS ARSEN ARSENYAN

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARSEN ARSENYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0520

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

ARSENYAN ARSEN

Tujunga, CA 91042-2359

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONG BORA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...) OF 08/16/2021

8/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...) OF 08/16/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

8/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

8/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/4/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/4/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of the Summons and Complaint) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of t...) of 08/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Bank Of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Bank Of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bank Of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bank Of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bank Of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Song, Bora