This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2022 at 02:49:56 (UTC).

BAMBADJAN BAMBA, ET AL. VS 5111-5117 BUFFALO AVENUE, LLC;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 BAMBADJAN BAMBA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 5111-5117 BUFFALO AVENUE, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6418

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANSANSAME GANOHON

THEOPHILIA BAMBA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM BAMBADJAN BAMBA

BAMBA BAMBADJAN

Defendants

R. SCOTT TUCKER & ASSOCATIES AKA RST & ASSOC

5111-5117 BUFFALO AVENUE LLC;

R. SCOTT TUCKER & ASSOCIATES AKA RST & ASSOC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OHN GERALD S.

Defendant Attorneys

CARPENTER GREGORY JAMES

LIE KAIULANI S

O'HARA MAUREEN CLAIRE

CARPENTER GREGORY J.

LIE KAIULANI SYOU-WEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/30/2021

11/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/30/2021

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/9/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Order

11/1/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF BAMBADJAN BAMBA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

11/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF BAMBADJAN BAMBA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Motion for Trial Preference

11/18/2021: Motion for Trial Preference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GERALD S. OHN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

11/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GERALD S. OHN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Case Management Statement

10/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Association of Attorney

7/8/2021: Association of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/21/2021: Answer

Association of Attorney

6/29/2021: Association of Attorney

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR THEOPHLIA

5/4/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR THEOPHLIA

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

5/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • Hearing01/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Hearing01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Gerald S. Ohn (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 37; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Plaintiff Bambadjan Bamba in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Trial Preference); Filed by Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Theophilia Bamba, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Ganohon Ansansame (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by 5111-5117 Buffalo Avenue, LLC; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 5111-5117 Buffalo Avenue, LLC; (Defendant); R. Scott Tucker & Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by 5111-5117 Buffalo Avenue, LLC; (Defendant); R. Scott Tucker & Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Theophilia Bamba, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Ganohon Ansansame (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Theophilia Bamba, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Ganohon Ansansame (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Theophilia Bamba, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Ganohon Ansansame (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Theophlia); Filed by Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Theophilia Bamba, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Bambadjan Bamba (Plaintiff); Ganohon Ansansame (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6418 Hearing Date: February 7, 2022 Dept: 37

HEARING DATE: February 7, 2022

CASE NUMBER: *******6418

CASE NAME: Bambadjan Bamba, individually and as guardian ad litem for minor Theophilia Bamba, et al. v. 5111-5117 Buffalo Avenue, LLC, et al.

MOVING PARTIES: Plaintiffs, Bambadjan Bamba, individually and as guardian ad litem for minor Theophilia Bamba, an individual and Ganohon Ansansame, an individual

OPPOSING PARTIES: Defendants, 5111-5117 Buffalo Avenue, LLC and R. Scott Tucker & Associates, also known as RST & assoc., et al.

TRIAL DATE: January 10, 2023

PROOF OF SERVICE: OK

MOTION: Plaintiffs’ Motion for Trial Preference

OPPOSITION: None as of February 2, 2022

REPLY: No opposition filed.

TENTATIVE: Plaintiffs’ motion is granted. Plaintiffs are to give notice.

Background

This is a habitability action arising out of Plaintiffs, Bambadjan Bamba, individually and as Guardian Ad Litem for minor Theophilia Bamba, an individual and Ganohon Ansansame’s (“Plaintiffs”) residency at 5117 Buffalo Avenue and 5107 Buffalo Avenue in Sherman Oaks, California. (the “Premises”) Defendants, 5111-5117 Buffalo Avenue, LLC and R. Scott Tucker & Associates, also known as RST & assoc. (“Defendants”) allegedly owned, operated and managed the Premises. According to the Complaint, the Premises exhibited a variety of substandard conditions including water leaks, toxic mold, holes in the ceiling and pest infestations during Plaintiffs’ residency. Defendants were allegedly notified by the Los Angeles County Department of Public Health (“LA County DPH”) of these deficiencies on numerous occasions, including on July 21, 2020 and March 23, 2021. Plaintiffs were allegedly harmed by Defendants’ failure to remedy the substandard conditions at the Premises despite receiving such notice from LA County DPH.

Plaintiffs’ Complaint alleges the following causes of action: (1) breach of implied warranty of habitability, (2) negligence, (3) nuisance, (4) breach of covenant of quiet enjoyment, (5) violations of Civil Code 1942.4.

Plaintiffs now move for trial preference. The motion is unopposed.

Discussion

Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure, section 36, subdivision (b), “A civil action to recover damages for wrongful death or personal injury shall be entitled to preference upon the motion of any party to the action who is under 14 years of age unless the court finds that the party does not have a substantial interest in the case as a whole.” (Code Civ. Proc., 36, subd. (a).) The court may also, in its discretion, grant a motion for preference that is supported by a showing that satisfies the court that the interests of justice will be served by granting the preference. (Id., 36, subd. (e).)

Plaintiffs contend that trial preference should be granted pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 36(b) because minor Plaintiff Theophilia Bamba (“Minor Plaintiff”) is under the age of 14, has suffered personal injuries as a result of Defendants’ actions and has a substantial interest in this case. (Motion, 2-5.) Plaintiffs submit a declaration from Plaintiff Bambadjan Bamba (“Bamba”) in support of this motion.

Bamba attests that he is the father and guardian ad litem of Minor Plaintiff, who is age 4. (Declaration of Bambajan Bamba (“Bamba Decl.”), 2.) Bamba, Plaintiff Ganohon Ansansame and Minor Plaintiff have resided at Apartment 2 of the Premises since January 2012. (Bamba Decl. 3.) According to Bamba, the Premises exhibited a variety of conditions during their residency, including, for example: “water damage; lack of sanitary plumbing; toxic mold in the floor, walls, ceilings and under sinks.” (Bamba Decl. 4.) According to Bamba, Minor Plaintiff suffered and continues to suffer personal injuries “due to the uninhabitable conditions at the Premises,” including “rashes, skin problems, insect bites,” and “constant allergy and flu0like symptoms.” (Bamba Decl. 5.) Minor Plaintiff has been treated for her injuries at Pediatric Associates Medical Group, 4330 Fulton Ave, Sherman Oaks, California. (Id.)

Defendants did not file an opposition to Plaintiffs’ motion and do not otherwise challenge Plaintiffs’ contentions.

The court finds that Plaintiffs have satisfied the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure section 36(b). Plaintiffs have demonstrated that Minor Plaintiff is under the age of 14 and that she has suffered personal injury as a result of Defendants’ alleged misconduct. Minor Plaintiff is a party to this action and thus has a substantial interest in this case as a whole. Thus, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 36, subdivision (b), trial preference is mandatory.

For these reasons, Plaintiffs’ motion is granted.

Conclusion

Plaintiffs’ motion is granted. Plaintiffs are to give notice.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R. SCOTT TUCKER & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIE KAIULANI S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'HARA MAUREEN CLAIRE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARPENTER GREGORY J.