This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2022 at 10:53:18 (UTC).

BALI CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 BALI CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0931

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALI CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendants

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

J.H. MCCORMICK INC. AKA MCCORMICK CONSTRUCTION CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARNO ANNA M

Defendant Attorney

RADMACHER BRENDA K.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/20/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Related Case

8/26/2022: Notice of Related Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ((Not the Lead Case)); Filed by J.H. McCormick Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bali Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bali Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bali Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BALI CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where J.H. MCCORMICK INC. A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RADMACHER BRENDA K.