This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 03:59:04 (UTC).

BALDOMERO SOLARES MUNOZ ET AL VS WEST BASIN CONTAINER TERMIN

Case Summary

On 10/05/2017 BALDOMERO SOLARES MUNOZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WEST BASIN CONTAINER TERMIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8603

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

MUNOZ BALDOMERO SOLARES

SOLARES GLORIA

Respondents and Defendants

WEST BASIN CONTAINER TERMINAL LLC

DOES 1-50

PORTS AMERICA INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN IVY B. ESQ

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

LERNER NEIL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/5/2017: Complaint

Summons

10/5/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

CoverSheet

10/5/2017: CoverSheet

Answer

1/4/2018: Answer

Unknown

5/14/2019: Unknown

Petition

5/7/2019: Petition

Answer

3/29/2019: Answer

Order

3/20/2019: Order

Stipulation and Order

2/9/2019: Stipulation and Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/8/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Lien

11/27/2018: Notice of Lien

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((Fictitious/Incorrect Name)); Filed by Baldomero Solares Munoz (Plaintiff); Baldomero Solares Munoz (Plaintiff); Gloria Solares (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketPetition (PETITION TO WITHDRAWAL DISMISSAL OF LIEN); Filed by Transguard Insurance Company of America/IAT (Claimant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ports America, Inc. (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order and Stipulation to Continue Trial FSC and related dates - FSC: 09-20-19 Trial: 10-04-19); Filed by West Basin Container Terminal, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to continue trial and FSC dates); Filed by West Basin Container Terminal, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Baldomero Solares Munoz (Plaintiff); Gloria Solares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Lien (Claim); Filed by Transguard Insurance Company of America/IAT (Claimant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by West Basin Container Terminal, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Baldomero Solares Munoz (Plaintiff); Gloria Solares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Baldomero Solares Munoz (Plaintiff); Gloria Solares (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8603    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

BALDOMERO SOLARES MUNOZ, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

WEST BASIN CONTAINER TERMINAL, LLC, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****8603

Hearing Date: January 14, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Plaintiffs seek to compel Defendant Ports America, Inc. (“Defendant”) to serve further answers to Form Interrogatory Number 4.1, which requires Defendant to provide information concerning its insurance coverage. Code of Civil Procedure section 2017.210 permits a party to obtain discovery “of the existence and contents of any agreement under which any insurance carrier may be liable to satisfy in whole or in part a judgment that may be entered in the action or to indemnify or reimburse for payments made to satisfy the judgment.” Defendant argues that it has a proprietary interest in keeping this information confidential. This concern does not override the clear dictates of section 2017.210. Indeed, this concern could be accommodated with a protective order. Defendant provides no legal authority stating that a party need not answer Form Interrogatory Number 4.1 under these (or any) circumstances.

There is no substantial (or any) justification for Defendant’s position. Nevertheless, the Court declines to order sanctions because Plaintiff did not comply with the Court’s order requiring an informal discovery conference (“IDC”). One was scheduled on August 15, 2019, but it was taken off-calendar and never rescheduled. Had Plaintiff complied with this requirement, the Court could have resolved this issue without a motion. Therefore, the motion was necessary only by virtue of Plaintiff’s failure to comply with the Court’s order, making an award of sanctions unjust.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Plaintiff’s motion to compel further responses to Form Interrogatory Number 4.1 is granted. Defendant shall provide a further response, without objections, within forty-five (45) days of notice of this order. This should afford ample time for Defendant to file a stipulation or a noticed motion for a protective order. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 14, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST BASIN CONTAINER TERMINAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LERNER NEIL S. ESQ.