Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 21:12:51 (UTC).

BAKHTA, YEKATERINA VS STEELE, CRAIG

Case Summary

On 03/23/2020 BAKHTA, YEKATERINA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against STEELE, CRAIG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOXER, DOREEN B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1908

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOXER, DOREEN B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAKHTA YEKATERINA

Respondent

STEELE CRAIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GOLDSTEIN CARY W.

BRANDT ROBERT CURTIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 59, Boxer, Doreen B., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 59, Boxer, Doreen B., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketRuling (Regarding Petitioner's Evidentiary Objection and and Request to Strike Declaration of Craig Steele )

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketObjection (Evidentiary Objections to and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Craig Steele ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Re: DV-115 & DV-116; ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Personal ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN CARY W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDT ROBERT CURTIS