This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 08:15:00 (UTC).

BAKER ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, ET AL., VS EMMETT FURLA OASIS FILM

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 BAKER ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMMETT FURLA OASIS FILM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7979

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAKER FILM FUND LLC

BAKER ENTERTAINMENT LLC

BAKER ENTERTAINMENT GROUP

Defendants

HIGROWTH (INCONCEIVABLE) LLC

GEORGIA FILM FUND TWENTY-NINE LLC

EMMETT FURLA OASIS LLC

EMMETT FURLA OASIS FILMS LLC

HIGROWTH INCONCEIVABLE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLF BRIAN G.

WOLF BRIAN GERALD

JONELIS DAVID BINDER

Defendant Attorney

KOTARSKI KENNETH ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Summons

8/18/2017: Summons

Notice of Ruling

10/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice - Notice of further Status Conference

12/14/2018: Notice - Notice of further Status Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation

10/5/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

5/18/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Order - Dismissal

10/11/2019: Order - Dismissal

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

9/14/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Complaint

8/18/2017: Complaint

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

8/9/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

11/2/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

12/14/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00

5/17/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

9/14/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00

3/16/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation

11/2/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by EMMETT FURLA OASIS FILMS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Post-Arbitration Status Conference); Filed by EMMETT FURLA OASIS FILMS, LLC (Defendant); GEORGIA FILM FUND TWENTY-NINE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNotice (of further Status Conference); Filed by BAKER ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); BAKER FILM FUND, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketStipulation (TO EXTEND TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by BAKER ENTERTAINMENT GROUP (Legacy Party); BAKER ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); BAKER FILM FUND, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by BAKER ENTERTAINMENT GROUP (Legacy Party); BAKER ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); BAKER FILM FUND, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by BAKER ENTERTAINMENT GROUP (Legacy Party); BAKER ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); BAKER FILM FUND, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BAKER ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); BAKER FILM FUND, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BAKER ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); BAKER FILM FUND, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.