This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 03:32:52 (UTC).

BAHEREH GOD-KHALILI, ET AL. VS STEVEN LYONS TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 BAHEREH GOD-KHALILI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STEVEN LYONS TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2444

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOD-KHALILI BAHEREH

KHALILI VAHID

Defendants

LYONS STEVEN

STEVEN LYONS TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

8/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BAHEREH GOD-KHALILI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BAHEREH GOD-KHALILI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BAHEREH GOD-KHALILI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BAHEREH GOD-KHALILI (Plaintiff); VAHID KHALILI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BAHEREH GOD-KHALILI (Plaintiff); VAHID KHALILI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BAHEREH GOD-KHALILI (Plaintiff); VAHID KHALILI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O