This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2022 at 09:28:15 (UTC).

BAHAREH CHESHMAGHIL VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 BAHAREH CHESHMAGHIL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1040

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHESHMAGHIL BAHAREH

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOHEN ISAAC

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/28/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/28/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/28/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BAHAREH CHESHMAGHIL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BAHAREH CHESHMAGHIL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BAHAREH CHESHMAGHIL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant