This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 09:16:31 (UTC).

BACHMAN QUACH VS ROBERT MICHEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 BACHMAN QUACH filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT MICHEL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1965

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUACH BACHMAN

Defendants

MICHEL ROBERT

SAN FERNANDO VALLEY ALARM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAYBROOKE SCOTT EVAN

PAIJUK VAROUJ GEORGE

Defendant Attorney

SULLIVAN PAUL F.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/18/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/18/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/18/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

5/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Association of Attorney

4/4/2022: Association of Attorney

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Bachman Quach (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Bachman Quach (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Robert Michel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bachman Quach (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bachman Quach (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bachman Quach (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN FERNANDO VALLEY ALARM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAIJUK VAROUJ GEORGE