This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 10:53:26 (UTC).

BABACK SALEHANI VS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 BABACK SALEHANI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5003

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUTH ANN KWAN

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALEHANI BABACK

Defendants

MENMUIR KERRY

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EGHBALI BENJAMIN

CHANG MICHAEL H.

Defendant Attorney

JENKINS HALEH R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

5/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

5/5/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/18/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service - No Service

3/18/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE

2/16/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE

2/16/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Baback Salehani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant); Kerry Menmuir (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant); Kerry Menmuir (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (Case Management Statement); Filed by Baback Salehani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant); Kerry Menmuir (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: proof of service;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Baback Salehani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) (proof of service); Filed by Baback Salehani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) (proof of service); Filed by Baback Salehani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Baback Salehani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Baback Salehani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Baback Salehani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EGHBALI BENJAMIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG MICHAEL HYUNJOON