This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 03:00:40 (UTC).

B FINANCIAL VS ALVIN JONG JIN PARK

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 B FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALVIN JONG JIN PARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4536

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B FINANCIAL

Defendants

PARK ALVIN JONG JIN

ALL BRAND CLOTHING INC. DOE 1

S4U APPAREL DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAPEER PHILIP DENNIS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON CHECKS AND LOAN AGREEMENTS

2/16/2018: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON CHECKS AND LOAN AGREEMENTS

SUMMONS

2/16/2018: SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/19/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Unknown

5/25/2018: Unknown

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/25/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/25/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/31/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/8/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/12/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/12/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/13/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/14/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/14/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/18/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/18/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order

7/25/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketMotion re: (for Relief From Dismissal; Supporting Declaration and Memorandum of Points and Authorities); Filed by B Financial (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default J...) of 03/26/2019 and Copy of 03-26-19 minute order); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default J...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment (c/from11-30-18)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by B Financial (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON CHECKS AND LOAN AGREEMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by B Financial (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less