Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2021 at 14:00:10 (UTC).

AZUCENA MARTINEZ CORDOVA VS RUBEN RODAS DE LEON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 AZUCENA MARTINEZ CORDOVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUBEN RODAS DE LEON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7547

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORDOVA AZUCENA MARTINEZ

Defendants

DE LEON RUBEN RODAS

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DINSMORE SCOTT DONALD

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/11/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2024
  • Hearing02/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Azucena Martinez Cordova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Azucena Martinez Cordova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Azucena Martinez Cordova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DINSMORE SCOTT D.